## Monday, March 30, 2015

### Finding Patterns Multiplication of 2 digit number part 2

```for i in range(25,100,10):

print(str(i)+"*"+str(i)+"=",i*i)

for j in range(10,80,10):
print(str(i)+"*"+str(i+j)+"=",i*(i+j))
print""

"""
Results

There is a sequence observe the first digits they are (6,8,11,13,16,18...)(2,3,2,3,2,3...)(6+2,8+3,11+2,13+3...)
I know 25*25 = 625 (25*25=(2*3)25)==>625
To get 25*35 all i need to do do is add 2 to 6 = 8
and change 25 to 75
so final answer would be 875

('25*25=', 625)
('25*35=', 875)
('25*45=', 1125)
('25*55=', 1375)
('25*65=', 1625)
('25*75=', 1875)
('25*85=', 2125)
('25*95=', 2375)

There is a sequence (12,12+3,15+4,19+3,22+4,26+3).

('35*35=', 1225)
('35*45=', 1575)
('35*55=', 1925)
('35*65=', 2275)
('35*75=', 2625)
('35*85=', 2975)
('35*95=', 3325)
('35*105=', 3675)

('45*45=', 2025)
('45*55=', 2475)
('45*65=', 2925)
('45*75=', 3375)
('45*85=', 3825)
('45*95=', 4275)
('45*105=', 4725)
('45*115=', 5175)

('55*55=', 3025)
('55*65=', 3575)
('55*75=', 4125)
('55*85=', 4675)
('55*95=', 5225)
('55*105=', 5775)
('55*115=', 6325)
('55*125=', 6875)

('65*65=', 4225)
('65*75=', 4875)
('65*85=', 5525)
('65*95=', 6175)
('65*105=', 6825)
('65*115=', 7475)
('65*125=', 8125)
('65*135=', 8775)

('75*75=', 5625)
('75*85=', 6375)
('75*95=', 7125)
('75*105=', 7875)
('75*115=', 8625)
('75*125=', 9375)
('75*135=', 10125)
('75*145=', 10875)

('85*85=', 7225)
('85*95=', 8075)
('85*105=', 8925)
('85*115=', 9775)
('85*125=', 10625)
('85*135=', 11475)
('85*145=', 12325)
('85*155=', 13175)

('95*95=', 9025)
('95*105=', 9975)
('95*115=', 10925)
('95*125=', 11875)
('95*135=', 12825)
('95*145=', 13775)
('95*155=', 14725)
('95*165

```
Learn python for fun.The popular blog with questions and answers to the python.Solutions to facebookhackercup,codejam,codechef.The fun way to learn python with me.Building some cool apps.