21 * 21 step 1 20 * 20 =400 step 2 20*1 1*20 ----- 40 Step 3 1*1 step 4 441 Base Method base is 2 21 *21 = 2*(21+1)|(1*1) =44|1=441 21*22 =2*(21+2)|2=462 21*23=2*(24)6 = 486 21*24=2*(25)|4=504 visualise 21*26 considering base 20 21 1(1 away from base 20) 26 6(6 away from base 20) ---------- 21+6|1*6 21+6 or 26+1 followed by 1*6 27|6 27*2|6 546 So within 20 or 30 we can do these caluclations easily Base 30 33*34 37*3|12 111|12 1122 or 33*34 I know 35*35=1225 (35-2)*(35-1) 1227-105 1122Learn python for fun.The popular blog with questions and answers to the python.Solutions to facebookhackercup,codejam,codechef.The fun way to learn python with me.Building some cool apps.

## Sunday, March 29, 2015

### Finding Patterns two digit multiplication part 1

Subscribe to:
Post Comments (Atom)

## No comments:

## Post a Comment